LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB313
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB313
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB313
Compare Versions
AB313 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB313 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB313 Amended August 17, 2011
AB313 Amended June 28, 2011
AB313 Amended June 7, 2011
AB313 Amended April 7, 2011
AB313 Amended March 14, 2011
AB313 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB313 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB313 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB313 Amended August 17, 2011
AB313 Amended June 28, 2011
AB313 Amended June 7, 2011
AB313 Amended April 7, 2011
AB313 Amended March 14, 2011
AB313 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare