|
07/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1685.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1444.).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|