LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB315
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB315
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB315
Compare Versions
AB315 Chaptered July 15, 2011
AB315 Enrolled July 6, 2011
AB315 Amended May 5, 2011
AB315 Amended April 7, 2011
AB315 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB315 Chaptered July 15, 2011
AB315 Enrolled July 6, 2011
AB315 Amended May 5, 2011
AB315 Amended April 7, 2011
AB315 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare