California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB316 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 316AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 30, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Carter  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Jeffries   )   (   Coauthor:   Senator   Anderson   )  FEBRUARY 9, 2011 An act to add Section 487j to the Penal Code, relating to theft. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 316, as amended, Carter. Grand theft: copper materials. Existing law  generally  provides that grand theft is theft when the money, labor, or real or personal property taken is of a value exceeding $950  and is punishable as either a misdemeanor or a felony  .  Existing law makes the amount threshold of the theft of certain items $250, including theft of farm crops and specified agricultural products.  This bill would provide that every person who  feloniously  steals, takes, or carries away copper materials which are of a value exceeding $950 is guilty of grand theft, punishable by a fine not exceeding $2,500,  or  imprisonment in a county jail not exceeding one year,  or by both that fine and imprisonment,  or  by  imprisonment in the state prison not exceeding 16 months, or 2 or 3 years  , or by both that fine and imprisonment   and a fine not to exceed $10,000  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 487j is added to the Penal Code, to read: 487j. Every person who  feloniously  steals, takes, or carries away copper materials of another, including, but not limited to, copper wire, copper cable, copper tubing, and copper piping, which are of a value exceeding nine hundred fifty dollars ($950) is guilty of grand theft. Grand theft of copper shall be punishable by a fine not exceeding two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500),  or   by  imprisonment in a county jail not exceeding one year,  or by both that fine and imprisonment,  or  by  imprisonment in the state prison not exceeding 16 months, or two  or three years, or by both that fine and imprisonment.   or three years and a fine not exceeding ten thousand dollars ($10,000).