California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB316 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill July 15, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill August 17, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 30, 2011