LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB316
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB316
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB316
Compare Versions
AB316 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB316 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB316 Amended August 17, 2011
AB316 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB316 Amended June 28, 2011
AB316 Amended May 27, 2011
AB316 Amended March 30, 2011
AB316 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB316 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB316 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB316 Amended August 17, 2011
AB316 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB316 Amended June 28, 2011
AB316 Amended May 27, 2011
AB316 Amended March 30, 2011
AB316 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare