|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3070.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2358.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1568.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|