California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011