|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 2930.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2188.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|