LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB320
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB320
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB320
Compare Versions
AB320 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB320 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB320 Amended June 14, 2011
AB320 Amended April 12, 2011
AB320 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB320 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB320 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB320 Amended June 14, 2011
AB320 Amended April 12, 2011
AB320 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare