|
02/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3795.).
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3771.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (February 21).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2818.).
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 13).
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 1038.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|