LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB324
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB324
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB324
Compare Versions
AB324 Chaptered February 29, 2012
AB324 Enrolled February 23, 2012
AB324 Amended February 7, 2012
AB324 Amended January 31, 2012
AB324 Amended July 13, 2011
AB324 Amended June 22, 2011
AB324 Amended March 15, 2011
AB324 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB324 Chaptered February 29, 2012
AB324 Enrolled February 23, 2012
AB324 Amended February 7, 2012
AB324 Amended January 31, 2012
AB324 Amended July 13, 2011
AB324 Amended June 22, 2011
AB324 Amended March 15, 2011
AB324 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare