|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2720.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 2080.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1242.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|