California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill July 7, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill April 13, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011