|
08/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2223.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1574.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 702.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|