BILL NUMBER: AB 349CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 172 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 4, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 4, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 27, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chesbro (Principal coauthor: Senator Evans) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Galgiani and Nielsen) (Coauthor: Senator La Malfa) FEBRUARY 10, 2011 An act to amend Section 35401.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 349, Chesbro. Vehicles: State Highway Route 101: licensed carriers of livestock. (1) Existing law exempts, until January 1, 2012, licensed carriers of livestock from certain limitations of access when those carriers are directly en route to or from a point of loading or unloading of livestock on specified portions of State Highway Route 101 located in the Counties of Del Norte, Humboldt, and Mendocino from its junction with State Highway Route 1 near Leggett north to the Oregon border, if the travel is necessary, incidental to the shipment of the livestock, and certain conditions are met. This bill would extend this exemption until January 1, 2015, and would also delete obsolete requirements from these provisions. (2) Existing law requires the Director of Transportation to notify the Secretary of State if, prior to January 1, 2012, the director determines that certain safety improvements to a portion of State Highway Route 101 have resulted in the reclassification of the entire segment as a terminal access route pursuant to specified provisions of the Vehicle Code and repeals the exemption described in (1) above on the date the secretary receives this notice. This bill would extend this date to January 1, 2015. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 35401.7 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 35401.7. (a) The limitations of access specified in subdivision (d) of Section 35401.5 do not apply to licensed carriers of livestock when those carriers are directly en route to or from a point of loading or unloading of livestock on those portions of State Highway Route 101 located in the Counties of Del Norte, Humboldt, and Mendocino from its junction with State Highway Route 1 near Leggett north to the Oregon border, if the travel is necessary and incidental to the shipment of the livestock. (b) The exemption allowed under this section does not apply unless all of the following conditions are met: (1) The length of the truck tractor, in combination with the semitrailer used to transport the livestock, does not exceed a total of 70 feet. (2) The distance from the kingpin to the rearmost axle of the semitrailer does not exceed 43 feet. (3) The length of the semitrailer does not exceed a total of 48 feet. (c) The exemption allowed under this section does not apply to travel conducted on the day prior to, or on the day of, any federally recognized holiday. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2015, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2015, deletes or extends that date. (e) (1) If prior to January 1, 2012, the Director of Transportation determines that the only adjustment to State Highway Route 101 possible to accommodate the truck sizes allowed to travel on portions of State Highway Route 101, pursuant to subdivisions (a) and (b) is the removal of any tree that has a diameter of 42 inches or greater, measured outside the bark, at 12 inches above ground on the side adjacent to the highest ground level, the director shall notify the Secretary of State of that determination. (2) If prior to January 1, 2015, the Director of Transportation determines that safety improvements to the portion of State Highway Route 101 described in subdivision (a) have resulted in the reclassification of the entire segment as a terminal access route pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 35401.5, the director shall notify the Secretary of State of that determination. (3) The notice required under paragraph (1) or (2) shall state that it is being made pursuant to this section. (4) This section is repealed on the date the Secretary of State receives either of the notices described in this subdivision.