California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill March 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill April 7, 2011

Amended

Bill February 18, 2011
Bill January 27, 2011