LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB36
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB36
Compare Versions
AB36 Chaptered April 7, 2011
AB36 Enrolled March 24, 2011
AB36 Amended February 18, 2011
AB36 Amended January 27, 2011
AB36 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB36 Chaptered April 7, 2011
AB36 Enrolled March 24, 2011
AB36 Amended February 18, 2011
AB36 Amended January 27, 2011
AB36 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare