|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 6621.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4975.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 3592.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|