California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 21, 2012