California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 15, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011