LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB374
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB374
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB374
Compare Versions
AB374 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB374 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB374 Amended August 15, 2012
AB374 Amended August 6, 2012
AB374 Amended June 20, 2012
AB374 Amended May 27, 2011
AB374 Amended May 11, 2011
AB374 Amended May 2, 2011
AB374 Amended April 25, 2011
AB374 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB374 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB374 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB374 Amended August 15, 2012
AB374 Amended August 6, 2012
AB374 Amended June 20, 2012
AB374 Amended May 27, 2011
AB374 Amended May 11, 2011
AB374 Amended May 2, 2011
AB374 Amended April 25, 2011
AB374 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare