|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2309.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held in committee, reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 1493.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1433.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|