California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill May 19, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011