California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill September 8, 2011
Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011