LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB378
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB378
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB378
Compare Versions
AB378 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB378 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB378 Amended September 8, 2011
AB378 Amended September 1, 2011
AB378 Amended August 15, 2011
AB378 Amended May 9, 2011
AB378 Amended April 4, 2011
AB378 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB378 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB378 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB378 Amended September 8, 2011
AB378 Amended September 1, 2011
AB378 Amended August 15, 2011
AB378 Amended May 9, 2011
AB378 Amended April 4, 2011
AB378 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare