|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 2715.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2083.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 1715.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|