California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 27, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011