California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 9, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012
Bill September 8, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011