LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB391
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB391
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB391
Compare Versions
AB391 Chaptered August 17, 2012
AB391 Enrolled August 6, 2012
AB391 Amended June 27, 2012
AB391 Amended June 7, 2012
AB391 Amended May 9, 2012
AB391 Amended April 18, 2012
AB391 Amended April 10, 2012
AB391 Amended January 23, 2012
AB391 Amended September 8, 2011
AB391 Amended May 27, 2011
AB391 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB391 Chaptered August 17, 2012
AB391 Enrolled August 6, 2012
AB391 Amended June 27, 2012
AB391 Amended June 7, 2012
AB391 Amended May 9, 2012
AB391 Amended April 18, 2012
AB391 Amended April 10, 2012
AB391 Amended January 23, 2012
AB391 Amended September 8, 2011
AB391 Amended May 27, 2011
AB391 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare