|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 6523.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4892.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1503.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|