LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB40
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB40
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB40
Compare Versions
AB40 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB40 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB40 Amended August 23, 2012
AB40 Amended August 21, 2012
AB40 Amended June 18, 2012
AB40 Amended June 4, 2012
AB40 Amended March 21, 2012
AB40 Amended March 21, 2011
AB40 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB40 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB40 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB40 Amended August 23, 2012
AB40 Amended August 21, 2012
AB40 Amended June 18, 2012
AB40 Amended June 4, 2012
AB40 Amended March 21, 2012
AB40 Amended March 21, 2011
AB40 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare