|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2553.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2015.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1721.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|