California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2011

Amended

Bill August 17, 2011
Bill June 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011