|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Became law without Governor's signature.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1960.).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1785.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|