California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011