California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill May 16, 2011
Bill March 17, 2011