LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB42
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB42
Compare Versions
AB42 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB42 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB42 Amended August 30, 2011
AB42 Amended June 21, 2011
AB42 Amended May 16, 2011
AB42 Amended March 17, 2011
AB42 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB42 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB42 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB42 Amended August 30, 2011
AB42 Amended June 21, 2011
AB42 Amended May 16, 2011
AB42 Amended March 17, 2011
AB42 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare