|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6145.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 20).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4376.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1663.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|