California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill June 21, 2012
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011