|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3190.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3059.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 2353.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1723.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|