California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill February 28, 2011