|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 3147.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2395.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1862.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 1864.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1785.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 2).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1692.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|