LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB438
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB438
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB438
Compare Versions
AB438 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB438 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB438 Amended September 2, 2011
AB438 Amended August 29, 2011
AB438 Amended August 18, 2011
AB438 Amended July 12, 2011
AB438 Amended June 27, 2011
AB438 Amended June 1, 2011
AB438 Amended May 27, 2011
AB438 Amended April 4, 2011
AB438 Amended March 29, 2011
AB438 Amended March 16, 2011
AB438 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB438 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB438 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB438 Amended September 2, 2011
AB438 Amended August 29, 2011
AB438 Amended August 18, 2011
AB438 Amended July 12, 2011
AB438 Amended June 27, 2011
AB438 Amended June 1, 2011
AB438 Amended May 27, 2011
AB438 Amended April 4, 2011
AB438 Amended March 29, 2011
AB438 Amended March 16, 2011
AB438 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare