|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6525.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4901.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1503.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|