LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB439
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB439
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB439
Compare Versions
AB439 Chaptered September 22, 2012
AB439 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB439 Amended August 24, 2012
AB439 Amended August 7, 2012
AB439 Amended June 15, 2012
AB439 Amended June 28, 2011
AB439 Amended May 18, 2011
AB439 Amended April 7, 2011
AB439 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB439 Chaptered September 22, 2012
AB439 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB439 Amended August 24, 2012
AB439 Amended August 7, 2012
AB439 Amended June 15, 2012
AB439 Amended June 28, 2011
AB439 Amended May 18, 2011
AB439 Amended April 7, 2011
AB439 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare