California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB45 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill June 14, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 11, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011