LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB45
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB45
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB45
Compare Versions
AB45 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB45 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB45 Amended August 24, 2012
AB45 Amended August 6, 2012
AB45 Amended June 7, 2012
AB45 Amended June 14, 2011
AB45 Amended May 9, 2011
AB45 Amended April 11, 2011
AB45 Amended March 29, 2011
AB45 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB45 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB45 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB45 Amended August 24, 2012
AB45 Amended August 6, 2012
AB45 Amended June 7, 2012
AB45 Amended June 14, 2011
AB45 Amended May 9, 2011
AB45 Amended April 11, 2011
AB45 Amended March 29, 2011
AB45 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare