|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 2381.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1854.).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 976.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|