California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 30, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011